|
07.05.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.08.1993 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
27.04.1993 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.1993 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.1993 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.1993 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.11.1992 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.03.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.12.1991 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.1991 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.08.1991 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.1991 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.1991 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.1991 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.07.1991 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.06.1991 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.1991 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.1991 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.03.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.09.1990 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
16 |
|
20.07.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1990 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.1989 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
09.08.1989 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.1989 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
27.10.1988 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.1988 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.1988 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.07.1988 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.06.1988 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.1988 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1988 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.04.1988 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.1988 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.11.1987 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.11.1987 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.1987 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.06.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1987 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.03.1987 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.1987 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
13.02.1987 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.1987 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.1987 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.1985 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.1985 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.1985 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.1984 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.1983 |
EPO/applicant correspondence crossed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.1983 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.08.1983 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.1983 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.1983 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
23.08.1983 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1983 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1983 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1983 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1983 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.1983 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
05.08.1983 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.1983 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1983 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |