EP0114304 - Vector processing hardware assist and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.1989 [1989/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drimak, Edward George 10 Oakview Drive Johnson City New York 13790 / US | [1984/31] | Representative(s) | Suringar, Willem Joachim Intellectual Property Department IBM Nederland N.V. Watsonweg 2 1423 ND Uithoorn / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Suringar, Willem Joachim Intellectual Property Department IBM Nederland N.V. Watsonweg 2 NL-1423 ND Uithoorn / NL | Application number, filing date | 83112629.7 | 15.12.1983 | [1984/31] | Priority number, date | US19820452190 | 22.12.1982 Original published format: US 452190 | [1984/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0114304 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0114304 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/347, G06F9/38 | [1984/31] | CPC: |
G06F15/8069 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/31] | Title | German: | Hardwarehilfe und Verfahren zur Vektorverarbeitung | [1984/31] | English: | Vector processing hardware assist and method | [1984/31] | French: | Assistance matérielle et méthode de traitement de vecteur | [1984/31] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.10.1984 | Examination requested [1985/02] | 12.02.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 27.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4128880 (CRAY JR SEYMOUR R); | [A]US3541528 (RANDELL BRIAN) | [Y] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 23, no. 4, September 1980, pages 1720-1724, New York (USA); | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 13, no. 2, July 1970, pages 420-421, New York (USA); | Examination | - W.K. Giloi: "Rechnerarchitektur", Sammlung Informatik, Heidelberger Taschenbücher Band 208, Spanger-Verlag, Berlin-Heidelberg-New York 1981, pages 63-71 |