|
31.10.1995 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.12.1991 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
24 |
|
29.11.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
25 |
|
26.10.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.10.1991 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.10.1991 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.09.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.09.1991 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.09.1991 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
05.09.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
29.07.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.07.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
17.07.1991 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.07.1991 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
34 |
|
24.06.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
29.05.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.1991 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.1991 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.05.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.05.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.05.1991 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.1991 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.03.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
01.02.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
7 |
|
23.01.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.12.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
18.12.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.12.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.12.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.11.1990 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.11.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.11.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.11.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.11.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.11.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.11.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.11.1990 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
27.10.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1990 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1990 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.1990 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.09.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.1990 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
24.07.1990 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.1990 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.07.1990 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.1990 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
8 |
|
11.07.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.1990 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.07.1990 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.07.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.07.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.05.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.1990 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.04.1990 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.1990 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.1990 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.03.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.03.1990 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
20.01.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
27.12.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.11.1989 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.1989 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
14 |
|
24.11.1989 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.1989 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.1989 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.1989 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.1989 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1989 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.1989 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.1989 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.1989 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.1989 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.1989 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
24.05.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.1989 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.1989 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1988 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.11.1988 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.07.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
28.06.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1988 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
16 |
|
26.04.1988 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.1988 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1988 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
15.02.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.1988 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1988 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.1987 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1987 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1987 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.07.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.07.1987 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
28.07.1987 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.09.1986 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.1986 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.1986 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.1986 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.1986 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.1986 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.1986 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.1986 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
19.03.1986 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.03.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.1986 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.03.1986 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.1986 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.12.1985 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.1985 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.10.1985 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.08.1985 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.01.1985 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.1984 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.1984 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1984 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1984 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.1984 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
10.01.1984 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1983 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1983 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.12.1983 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
18.12.1983 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
11 |