|
23.04.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.1990 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
10 |
|
24.10.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.10.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.10.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
09.09.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.1989 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1989 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1989 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1989 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1989 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1989 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1989 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.1989 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.1989 |
Description |
Appeal |
8 |
|
12.06.1989 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.1989 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1989 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1989 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.03.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.1989 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.1989 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.02.1989 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.1989 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.1989 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.1989 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.1989 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.02.1989 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.1989 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1989 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1989 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1989 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1988 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.1988 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1988 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.1988 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.1988 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.11.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.1988 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.09.1988 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.08.1988 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.08.1988 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.08.1988 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.08.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.1988 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.07.1988 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.07.1988 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1988 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1988 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1988 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.1988 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1988 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
18.05.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1988 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1988 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1988 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.1988 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.03.1988 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.02.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.1987 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.1987 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.1987 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.10.1987 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
06.08.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.1987 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.1987 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.1987 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1987 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.1987 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.1987 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.02.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.02.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.02.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.02.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.02.1987 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.02.1987 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.02.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.02.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
19.02.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.02.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.02.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.02.1987 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.04.1986 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.1985 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.11.1985 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.1985 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.1985 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.1985 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.1985 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.1985 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.1985 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.1985 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
19.06.1985 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.1985 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.04.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.1985 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.02.1985 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.1984 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.12.1983 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.1983 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.1983 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1983 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1983 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1983 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
18.07.1983 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1983 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1983 |
Description |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
18.07.1983 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1983 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1983 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1983 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |