EP0088487 - Semiconductor device, e.g. for controlling a thermal printing head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.1990 [1990/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/37] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Hirokazu Sani-haitsu 507 2-13-18, Chuo Yamato-shi Kanagawa 242 / JP | 02 /
Akiyama, Takehiro Fujitsu Dai-1 Ichigao-ryo 2-2-5, Edakita Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227 / JP | [1983/37] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/11] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1983/37] | Abbott, Leonard Charles GILL JENNINGS & EVERY 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HN / GB | Application number, filing date | 83300225.6 | 18.01.1983 | [1983/37] | Priority number, date | JP19820006335 | 19.01.1982 Original published format: JP 633582 | [1983/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0088487 | Date: | 14.09.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0088487 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0088487 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/40, G11C5/00 | [1986/40] | CPC: |
H04N1/40031 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1983/37] | H04N1/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1983/37] | Title | German: | Halbleitervorrichtung, z.B. zum Steuern eines thermischen Druckkopfs | [1983/37] | English: | Semiconductor device, e.g. for controlling a thermal printing head | [1983/37] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur, p.ex. pour la commande d'une tête d'impression | [1983/37] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/20] | 14.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP54114927 ; | [A]JP55070987 ; | [A]JP55070986 ; | [A]US4151611 (NAMIMOTO KEIJI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0033634 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]JPS56109769 (RICOH KK) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 136 (E-151), 13th November 1979; & JP-A-54 114 927 (FUJITSU K.K.) 09-07-1979, & JP54114927 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 115 (P-23)[597], 16th August 1980; & JP-A-55 070 987 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 28-05-1980, & JP55070987 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 115 (P-23)[597], 16th August 1980; & JP-A-55 070 986 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 28-05-1980, & JP55070986 A 00000000 |