|
22.07.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1999 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.03.1997 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1993 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
28 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
28 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
30 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
30 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
30 |
|
29.07.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
28 |
|
29.07.1993 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.07.1993 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.07.1993 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
19.07.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
19.07.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
14.07.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
14.07.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
14.07.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
29.06.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
29.06.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
28.06.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.06.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.06.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.06.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.06.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.06.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.06.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.05.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.1993 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.1993 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.1993 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.05.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.05.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
14.12.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
14.12.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
14.12.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
23.11.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.1992 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.1992 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.1992 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.06.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.06.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.06.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.05.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.05.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.05.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.05.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.05.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
21.05.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
21.05.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1992 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1992 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1992 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.05.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.05.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1992 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1992 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1992 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1992 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1992 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1992 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.1992 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.1992 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.1992 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.03.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.03.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.03.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.03.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Composition of the board (only boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.1992 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.1992 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.1992 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1992 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
04.02.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.01.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.11.1991 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.1991 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.11.1991 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.1991 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.11.1991 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
40 |
|
21.11.1991 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.1991 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.1991 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.10.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.10.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1991 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.1991 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.09.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.09.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.09.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.09.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.09.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.09.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.1991 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1991 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.1991 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1991 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1991 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1991 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.1991 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.05.1991 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.04.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.04.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1991 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.03.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.03.1991 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.11.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
09.10.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
09.10.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
09.10.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
09.10.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
09.10.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.08.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.08.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.08.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.06.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.06.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.06.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.06.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.1990 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.1990 |
Annex |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.05.1990 |
Annex |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.05.1990 |
Annex |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.05.1990 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.1990 |
Annex |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.05.1990 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.1990 |
Annex |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.1990 |
Annex |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.05.1990 |
Annex |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.05.1990 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.05.1990 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.05.1990 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.05.1990 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.05.1990 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.05.1990 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.04.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.04.1990 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.03.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1990 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.1990 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.1990 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.03.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.03.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
16 |
|
06.03.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
10 |
|
06.03.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
06.03.1990 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.1990 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.1990 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.1990 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.1990 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
06.03.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.03.1990 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
37 |
|
02.03.1990 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
65 |
|
02.03.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.02.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.02.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.01.1990 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.01.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.01.1990 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.01.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
18.11.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.1989 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.09.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.09.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.08.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.06.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
9 |
|
22.06.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.06.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1989 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1989 |
Noting of loss of rights (opposition deemed not to have been filed) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.05.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.05.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.05.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.05.1989 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1989 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1989 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.1989 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.1989 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.04.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.04.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.04.1989 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1989 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1989 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.04.1989 |
Reply to the communication concerning admissibility of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.04.1989 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
43 |
|
21.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
43 |
|
21.04.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
20.04.1989 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.04.1989 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
12 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.06.1988 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.1988 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.1988 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.1988 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.1988 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.1988 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.1988 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.1987 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.09.1987 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
03.08.1987 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.05.1987 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.1987 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1987 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1987 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.1987 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.01.1987 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.01.1987 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1986 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.06.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.1986 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.05.1986 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.1986 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.1986 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1986 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.1986 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.02.1986 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.02.1986 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.11.1985 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.10.1984 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.1984 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.1984 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.10.1984 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1984 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.08.1984 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1984 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.1984 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.1983 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.03.1983 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.1983 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.1983 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.1983 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
11.03.1983 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.1983 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.03.1983 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.1983 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.03.1983 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.03.1983 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.1983 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.03.1983 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.1983 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |