EP0092356 - A process for manufacturing minute capsules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLETON PAPERS INC. P.O. Box 359 825 East Wisconsin Avenue Appleton Wisconsin 54912 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | For all designated states APPLETON PAPERS INC. P.O. Box 359 825 East Wisconsin Avenue Appleton Wisconsin 54912 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayford, Donald Edward 512 East Parkway Blvd Appleton Wisconsin Wi 54911 / US | [1983/43] | Representative(s) | Norris, Richard John, et al The Wiggins Teape Group Limited Group Patents Department Butler's Court Beaconsfield Buckinghamshire HP9 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/43] | Norris, Richard John, et al The Wiggins Teape Group Limited Group Patents Department Butler's Court Beaconsfield Buckinghamshire HP9 1RT / GB | Application number, filing date | 83302008.4 | 11.04.1983 | [1983/43] | Priority number, date | US19820370323 | 20.04.1982 Original published format: US 370323 | [1983/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0092356 | Date: | 26.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0092356 | Date: | 07.12.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0092356 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/02 | [1983/43] | CPC: |
B41M5/165 (EP,US);
B01J13/18 (EP,US);
C08L61/28 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2985 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L61/28, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Mikrokapseln | [1983/43] | English: | A process for manufacturing minute capsules | [1983/43] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de microcapsules | [1983/43] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1983 | Examination requested [1983/43] | 27.02.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.05.1985 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.05.1985 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.04.1986 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2114380 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [X]BE829482R ; | [AD]US4105823 (HASLER DAVID JOHN, et al); | [A]FR2445171 (KANZAKI PAPER MFG CO LTD [JP]); | [X]GB2073132 (WIGGINS TEAPE GROUP LTD); | [A]EP0046415 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) |