EP0107934 - Electrodes, methods of manufacturing such electrodes and use of such electrodes in electrolytic cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1989 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1989 [1989/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1987/38] |
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states Marston Palmer Ltd. Wobaston Road Fordhouses Wolverhampton WV10 6QJ / GB | ||
Former [1984/19] | For all designated states MARSTON PALMER LIMITED formerly known as IMI MARSTON LIMITED Wobaston Road Fordhouses Wolverhampton WV10 6QJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayfield, Peter Charles Steele Church Garth St. Peter's Lane Bickenhill Solihull W.Midlands B92 0DR / GB | [1984/19] | Representative(s) | Arnold, Graham Donald, et al ICI Group Intellectual Property PO Box 11 the Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Arnold, Graham Donald, et al ICI Group Intellectual Property P.O.Box 90 Wilton Cleveland TS90 8JE / GB | ||
Former [1987/21] | Walmsley, David Arthur Gregson Intellectual Property Department ICI Chemicals & Polymers Ltd P.O. Box 11 The Heath Runcorn Cheshire WA7 4QE / GB | ||
Former [1984/19] | Smith, Rex Clise IMI plc Patents and Licensing Department P.O. Box 216 Witton Birmingham B6 7BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 83306003.1 | 04.10.1983 | [1984/19] | Priority number, date | GB19820031029 | 29.10.1982 Original published format: GB 8231029 | GB19830016808 | 21.06.1983 Original published format: GB 8316808 | [1984/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0107934 | Date: | 09.05.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0107934 | Date: | 10.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0107934 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C23F13/00, C25B11/04, C25B11/02, C25C7/02 | [1984/19] | CPC: |
C25C7/02 (EP,US);
C23F13/02 (EP,US);
C25B11/02 (EP,US);
C25B11/091 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/24] |
Former [1984/19] | BE, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Elektroden, Herstellungsverfahren und Anwendung solcher Elektroden in Elektrolysezellen | [1984/19] | English: | Electrodes, methods of manufacturing such electrodes and use of such electrodes in electrolytic cells | [1984/19] | French: | Electrodes, leurs procédés de fabrication et utilisation de telles électrodes dans des cellules d'électrolyse | [1984/19] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/31] | 23.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]GB1274242 (GWYNN ROSS MERTON [US], et al); | [Y]GB1327760 (IMP METAL IND KYNOCH LTD); | [Y]US3711382 (ANTHONY P); | [A]GB1373712 (CONRADTY FA C) | Examination | EP0052986 |