|
30.06.1998 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.1992 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1992 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1992 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1992 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1992 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1992 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
05.05.1992 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.05.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
05.05.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.05.1992 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1992 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.05.1992 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.04.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.1992 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.02.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.02.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.02.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.1992 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.02.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.1989 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1989 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1989 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.1989 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.1989 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.1989 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.09.1989 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.08.1989 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.06.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.1989 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1989 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.06.1989 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1989 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.06.1989 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.1989 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1989 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1989 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1989 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1989 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.1989 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1989 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.02.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
25.11.1988 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.1988 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.1988 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.1988 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.1988 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.11.1988 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
11.11.1988 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1988 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1988 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1988 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1988 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1988 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1988 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.1988 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.1988 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.08.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.08.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.1988 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.1988 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.07.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.07.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.07.1988 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.04.1988 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.03.1988 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.1988 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.01.1988 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.01.1988 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.01.1988 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.1988 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.1988 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1987 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1987 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1987 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.09.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.09.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.08.1987 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1987 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1987 |
N/A |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.08.1987 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1987 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.08.1987 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.08.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Request for written evidence |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.1987 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1987 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1987 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.07.1987 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.07.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.1987 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.07.1987 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.07.1987 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1987 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1987 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1987 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.07.1987 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.07.1987 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.07.1987 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.1987 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.06.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.06.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
15.06.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.06.1987 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.09.1986 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.1986 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.1986 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.02.1986 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.09.1985 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.1985 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
09.07.1985 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.1984 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.04.1984 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.1984 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1984 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1984 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.08.1983 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1983 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.08.1983 |
Description |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
16.08.1983 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1983 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1983 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
16.08.1983 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |