|
20.09.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.02.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.04.1994 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.1994 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.02.1994 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
07.02.1994 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
07.02.1994 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.02.1994 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.01.1994 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
19.01.1994 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
29.12.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.12.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.1993 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.11.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.11.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.08.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.08.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
28.08.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
28.08.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.08.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.06.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.1993 |
Extension of time limit: YES |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.1993 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.1993 |
F3203 Composition of the Board (J) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
55 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
02.01.1992 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
16.11.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.1991 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.10.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.10.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.10.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.10.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.10.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
22.08.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.08.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.08.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.08.1991 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.1991 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.1991 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.08.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.08.1991 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.1991 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.1991 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.1991 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.1991 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.05.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.1991 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.12.1990 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.1990 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
03.08.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.07.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.07.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
28.07.1990 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
10.07.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.1990 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.1990 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1990 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.05.1990 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.04.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.1990 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.04.1990 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.1990 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.1990 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
27 |
|
18.04.1990 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.1990 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.1990 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.1990 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.1990 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.1990 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.01.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1990 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.01.1990 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1989 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.12.1989 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.12.1989 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.12.1989 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.12.1989 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.12.1989 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.1989 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.1989 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.1989 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.1989 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.1989 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.1989 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.1989 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1989 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.08.1989 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1989 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1989 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.1989 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.1989 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.06.1989 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.06.1989 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.06.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.1989 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.02.1989 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.11.1988 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.1988 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.08.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1988 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.04.1988 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.1988 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.1988 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.1988 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
22.03.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1987 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.1987 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.10.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.10.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
13.10.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1987 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.09.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.1987 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.1987 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.1987 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
29.08.1987 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.1987 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.1986 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.1986 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.1986 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.12.1986 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.1986 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.1986 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.1986 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.09.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1986 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.1986 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1986 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.1986 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.1986 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1986 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.1986 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.1986 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.07.1986 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.1986 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.1986 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.1986 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.1986 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.1986 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.1986 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.05.1986 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.1986 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.1986 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.03.1986 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1986 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.03.1986 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
13.02.1986 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.1985 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.1985 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.12.1985 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.12.1985 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.1985 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.1985 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.1985 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.09.1985 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
28.09.1985 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.1985 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.1985 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.1985 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.1985 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.07.1985 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.07.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.1985 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.07.1985 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.1985 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.07.1985 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.1984 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.1984 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.1983 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1983 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1983 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.1983 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.1983 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.05.1983 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.05.1983 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.1983 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.1983 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.05.1983 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
17.05.1983 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
25.10.1981 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.1980 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |