EP0093095 - A method and an apparatus for identifying a detector giving an alarm in a loop circuit having a predetermined number of detectors connected in parallel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cerberus AG Alte Landstrasse 411 CH-8708 Männedorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/38] | For all designated states CERBERUS AG Alte Landstrasse 411 CH-8708 Männedorf / CH | ||
Former [1983/44] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON Patent and Trademark Department S-126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Glanshed, Benni Göran Ingemar Evalundsvägen 156 S-139 00 Älta / SE | [1983/44] | Representative(s) | Tiemann, Ulrich c/o Cerberus AG Patentabteilung Alte Landstrasse 411 8708 Männedorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1985/40] | Tiemann, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing. c/o Cerberus AG Patentabteilung Alte Landstrasse 411 CH-8708 Männedorf / CH | ||
Former [1985/38] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1983/44] | Johansson, Lars E., et al c/o L.A. Groth & Co. KB, Box 6107 S-102 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 83850093.2 | 12.04.1983 | [1983/44] | Priority number, date | SE19820002566 | 23.04.1982 Original published format: SE 8202566 | [1983/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0093095 | Date: | 02.11.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0093095 | Date: | 30.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G08B25/00 | [1983/44] | CPC: |
G08B25/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI, NL [1983/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zum Identifizieren eines alarmgebenden Detektors in einer Schleife mit einer bestimmten Zahl parallel geschalteter Detektoren | [1983/44] | English: | A method and an apparatus for identifying a detector giving an alarm in a loop circuit having a predetermined number of detectors connected in parallel | [1983/44] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour identifier un détecteur donnant une alarme dans un circuit en boucle ayant un nombre prédéterminé de détecteurs connectés en parallèle | [1983/44] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 21.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/13] | 02.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/36] | 12.04.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1989/36] | Request for further processing for: | 11.07.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 11.07.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.08.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3803594 (KLEIN C, et al); | [A]US3846794 ; | [A]US4228424 ; | [A]US3757301 ; | [A]US3778796 |