EP0160642 - POLYMERIC LIGHT STABILIZERS CONTAINING POLYALKYLPIPERIDINE GROUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/50] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | |||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | |||
Former [1985/46] | For:NL
Ford Motor Company The American Road Dearborn, MI 48121 / US | ||
For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | |||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KORDOMENOS, Panagiotis, I. 42758 Elizabeth Circle Mt. Clemens, MI 48044 / US | 02 /
ALEXANDER, Delores, J. 29060 Lone Elm Lane Southfield, MI 48076 / US | 03 /
THOMSON, David, M. 37069 Charter Oaks Blvd. Mt. Clemens, MI 48043 / US | [1985/46] | Representative(s) | Woodcraft, David Charles, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/47] | Woodcraft, David Charles, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London, WC1V 6SE / GB | ||
Former [1985/46] | Messulam, Alec Moses A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 83903671.2 | 13.10.1983 | [1985/46] | WO1983US01597 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8501734 | Date: | 25.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0160642 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.1985 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1985/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0160642 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.04.1985 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/50, C08K5/34 | [1985/46] | CPC: |
C08K5/3435 (EP,US);
C08G59/10 (EP,US);
C08G59/56 (EP,US);
C09D163/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/46] | Title | German: | POLYMERE LICHTSTABILISIERENDE MITTEL POLYALKYLPIPERIDINGRUPPIERUNGEN ENTHALTEND | [1985/46] | English: | POLYMERIC LIGHT STABILIZERS CONTAINING POLYALKYLPIPERIDINE GROUPS | [1985/46] | French: | AGENTS POLYMERES DE STABILISATION A LA LUMIERE CONTENANT DES GROUPES DE POLYALKYLPIPERIDINE | [1985/46] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.1985 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.1985 | Search fee paid | 21.06.1985 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.1985 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/46] | 21.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 26.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3684765 (MATSUI KATSUAKI, et al); | [A]US4166813 (KURUMADA TOMOYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US4265803 (SOMA NOBUO, et al); | [A]US4299926 (RODY JEAN, et al); | [A]US4316837 (MOLT KENNETH R, et al) |