EP0113677 - Signal processing method in autoradiography [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/29] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiraishi, Hisashi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210, Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Kimura, Tsutomu c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 798, Miyanodai Kaisei-machi Ashigara-kami-gun Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Hishinuma, Kazuhiro c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 798, Miyanodai Kaisei-machi Ashigara-kami-gun Kanagawa / JP | [1984/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84100150.6 | 09.01.1984 | [1984/29] | Priority number, date | JP19830001328 | 08.01.1983 Original published format: JP 132883 | JP19830001329 | 08.01.1983 Original published format: JP 132983 | JP19830001334 | 08.01.1983 Original published format: JP 133483 | JP19830057415 | 31.03.1983 Original published format: JP 5741583 | [1984/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0113677 | Date: | 18.07.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0113677 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/29 | [1984/29] | CPC: |
G01T1/2014 (EP,US);
G01T1/2012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, NL, SE [1984/29] | Title | German: | Signalbearbeitungsmethode in der Autoradiographie | [1984/29] | English: | Signal processing method in autoradiography | [1984/29] | French: | Dispositif de traitement d'un signal pour autoradiographie | [1984/29] | File destroyed: | 02.02.2002 | Examination procedure | 02.02.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/12] | 27.10.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.08.1989 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4346295 (TANAKA KAZUYOSHI, et al) | [A] - NATURE, vol. 274, no. 5666, 6th July 1978, pages 87-89, Macmillan Journals LtdGB; J. STANLEY et al.: "A different approach to RNA sequencing" | [A] - G.I.T. FACHZEITSCHRIFT F]R DAS LABORATORIUM, vol. 18, no. 8, August 1974page 794; "D}nnschichtchromatographie-Auswertger{t" |