EP0114615 - Alkaline phosphatase labeled steroid hormone glucoronides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 14th Street and Sheridan Road North St North Chicago Illinois 60064 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 14th Street and Sheridan Road North St North Chicago, Illinois 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
March, Steven Carl 1307 Winchester Road Libertyville, I11. 60048 / US | 02 /
Shipchandler, Mohammed Tyebji 640 Burdick Libertyville, I11. 60048 / IN | [1984/31] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1984/31] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 84100250.4 | 12.01.1984 | [1984/31] | Priority number, date | US19830460734 | 25.01.1983 Original published format: US 460734 | [1984/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0114615 | Date: | 01.08.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/31] | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/74, G01N33/54 | [1984/31] | CPC: |
G01N33/535 (EP);
G01N33/743 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1984/31] | Title | German: | Alkalinische phosphatase markierte Steroidhormon-Glucuronide | [1984/31] | English: | Alkaline phosphatase labeled steroid hormone glucoronides | [1984/31] | French: | Glucuronides d'hormone stéroide marqués à la phosphatase alcaline | [1984/31] | File destroyed: | 11.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 10.03.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.02.1987 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |