EP0152508 - Coreless-brushless motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.03.1991 [1991/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANGYO DENKIKIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-15, Shin Ogawa-cho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | For all designated states KANGYO DENKIKIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-15, Shin Ogawa-cho Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sudo, Michio 4-43, Honcho 1-chome Kuki-shi Saitama / JP | [1985/35] | Representative(s) | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 D-81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84101889.8 | 23.02.1984 | [1985/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0152508 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0152508 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0152508 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H02K29/00, H02K3/26, H02P6/02 | [1985/35] | CPC: |
H02K29/08 (EP);
H02K29/14 (EP);
H02K3/26 (EP);
H05K3/4046 (EP);
H05K2201/0382 (EP);
H05K2201/10303 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1985/35] | Title | German: | Kernloser, bürstenloser Motor | [1985/35] | English: | Coreless-brushless motor | [1985/35] | French: | Moteur sans balai et sans noyau | [1985/35] | File destroyed: | 16.07.1996 | Miscellaneous | EPB 1989/37: Divisional applications 87108984, 87108986 filed on 23.06.87 | Examination procedure | 23.02.1984 | Examination requested [1985/35] | 23.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP87108984.3 / EP0246670 | EP87108986.8 / EP0246671 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 23.02.1990 | [1991/11] | Documents cited: | Search | JP57186974 [ ]; | JP57202867 [ ]; | JP57122661 [ ]; | JP58003558 [ ]; | JP55153263 [ ]; | EP0030008 [ ]; | DE3132483 [ ]; | DE2840562 [ ] | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 36, 15th February 1983; & JP,A,57 186 974 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 17-11-1982; Abstract, & JP57186974 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 52, 2th March 1983 & JP,A,57 202 867 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 11-12-1982, Abstract, & JP57202867 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 218, 2th November 1982; & JP,A,57 122 661 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 30-07-1982, Abstract, & JP57122661 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 119, 24th May 1983; JP,A,58 036 145 (KANGIYOUZ DENKI K.K.) 03-03-1983, Abstract | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 76, 30th March 1983; & JP,A,58 003 558 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 10-01-1983, & JP58003558 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 27, 18th February 1981; & JP,A,55 153 263 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 29-11-1980, & JP55153263 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 115, 19th May 1983; JP,A,58 33 958 (KANGIYOU DENKI K.K.) 28-02-1983 | Examination | JP57202867 | JP5836145 | JP583358 | JP55153263 | JP5833958 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN , vol. 7, no.52,2th March; & JP-A-57-202867, & JP57202867 A 00000000 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol.7, no.119, 24th May 1983;& JP-A-58- 36145, & JP5836145 A 00000000 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol.7,no 76, 30th March 1983; & JP-A-58-3358, & JP583358 A 00000000 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol.5, no.27,18th February 1981;& JP-A-55-153263, & JP55153263 A 00000000 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol 7, no 115, 19th May 1983 & JP-A-58-33958, & JP5833958 A 00000000 |