EP0130628 - Real time transparent serial/echoplex interface apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1991 [1991/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes Inc. One Elmcroft Stamford, CT 06926-0790 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/30] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES INC. One Elmcroft Stamford Connecticut 06926-0790 / US | ||
Former [1985/02] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES, INC. Walter H. Wheeler, Jr. Drive Stamford Connecticut 06926 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duwel, Edward Charles 51 Firehouse Road Trumbull Connect. 06611 / US | 02 /
Soderberg, John Henry 624 B Onondaga Lane Stratford, Ct. 06497 / US | [1985/02] | Representative(s) | Lehn, Werner, et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | Lehn, Werner, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 84107881.9 | 05.07.1984 | [1985/02] | Priority number, date | US19830510792 | 05.07.1983 Original published format: US 510792 | [1985/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0130628 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0130628 | Date: | 23.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0130628 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/02, G06F13/42 | [1985/02] | CPC: |
G06F13/4226 (EP,US);
G07B17/0008 (EP,US);
G07B17/00314 (EP,US);
G07B17/00733 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00137 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00322 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00338 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1985/02] | Title | German: | Transparentes Echtzeit-Serien/Echoplex-Interface | [1985/02] | English: | Real time transparent serial/echoplex interface apparatus | [1985/02] | French: | Dispositif d'interface transparent, en série/echoplex et en temps réel | [1985/02] | Examination procedure | 10.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/28] | 28.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4143418 (HODGE GORDON W, et al); | [A]US3909782 (MAZIER CLAUDE MARIE GASTON JAC); | [A]GB2094522 (PITNEY BOWES INC); | [A]US4133042 (WALLACE BEN W); | [A]US4174536 (JACOBSEN ROBERT G [US], et al) |