EP0137508 - Method of and device for the digital cancellation of the echo generated in connections with time-varying characteristics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1988 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.1988 [1988/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSELT Centro Studi e Laboratori Telecomunicazioni S.p.A. Via Guglielmo Reiss Romoli, 274 10148 Turin / IT | For all designated states TELESPAZIO S.p.A. per le Comunicazioni spaziali Via A. Bergamini, 50 Rome / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1985/16] | For all designated states CSELT Centro Studi e Laboratori Telecomunicazioni S.p.A. Via Guglielmo Reiss Romoli, 274 I-10148 Turin / IT | ||
For all designated states TELESPAZIO S.p.A. per le Comunicazioni spaziali Via A. Bergamini, 50 Rome / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nebbia, Luciano Via Monte Ortigara 41 Turin / IT | 02 /
Montagna, Roberto Via Arona 8 Turin / IT | [1985/16] | Representative(s) | Riederer Freiherr von Paar, Anton, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Kanzlei Landshut Postfach 26 64 84010 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/16] | Riederer Freiherr von Paar zu Schönau, Anton, et al Van der Werth, Lederer & Riederer Postfach 2664 D-84010 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 84112242.7 | 11.10.1984 | [1985/16] | Priority number, date | IT19830068047 | 12.10.1983 Original published format: IT 6804783 | [1985/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0137508 | Date: | 17.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0137508 | Date: | 23.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/23 | [1985/16] | CPC: |
H04B3/232 (EP,US);
H04B3/234 (EP,US);
H04B3/238 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1985/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die digitale Kompensation des in Verbindungen mit zeitvariablen Charakteristiken erzeugten Echos | [1985/29] | English: | Method of and device for the digital cancellation of the echo generated in connections with time-varying characteristics | [1985/16] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'annulation numérique de l'écho engendré dans des connexions à caractéristiques temporellement variables | [1985/29] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 12.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.02.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.06.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3721777 (THOMAS E); | [A]FR2277470 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]); | [A]US4131767 (WEINSTEIN STEPHEN B); | [A]EP0044598 (TRT TELECOM RADIO ELECTR [FR]); | [A]WO8301715 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) |