|
03.07.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.1993 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.06.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.06.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.06.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
16 |
|
25.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
17.06.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.11.1992 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.10.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
30.04.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.04.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.04.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1992 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.02.1992 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1992 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.02.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.12.1991 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1991 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.08.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.07.1991 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.02.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1991 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.02.1991 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.1991 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1991 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.10.1990 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.1990 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.1990 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.01.1990 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1989 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1989 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.1989 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.1989 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.1989 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.1989 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.1989 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
14.04.1989 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.1988 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.1988 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.1988 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.04.1987 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.1985 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.1984 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.1984 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.1984 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1984 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
06.08.1984 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1984 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
06.08.1984 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
19.11.1980 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.1980 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1980 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |