|
21.02.1995 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.1994 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.1993 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.1993 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.1993 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.10.1993 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.1993 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.07.1993 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
20.07.1993 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.07.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
24.05.1993 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.1993 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.04.1993 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1992 |
Cover page: Decision (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.1992 |
Cover page: Decision (ex parte) |
Appeal |
13 |
|
25.05.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1992 |
Letter Legal Board, with references of sender |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.05.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
35 |
|
06.04.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.03.1992 |
Communication with time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.07.1991 |
F3203 Composition of the Board (J) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.1991 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.1990 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.1990 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
28.09.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.07.1990 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.1990 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.1990 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.10.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.09.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.1989 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.1989 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.06.1989 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.03.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.12.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
22.12.1988 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.1988 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.1987 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.1987 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1987 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.1987 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.1987 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.1984 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.1984 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.04.1984 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
24.04.1984 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
02.04.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.04.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.04.1984 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.1984 |
Amended documents not in agreement with original documents |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.1984 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.03.1984 |
Description |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
16.03.1984 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.1984 |
Deficiencies in application documents |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.01.1984 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.1984 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.1984 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
03.01.1984 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.1984 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.01.1984 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |