|
18.03.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1994 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1994 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.1994 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.1994 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.1994 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1994 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1994 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1994 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.01.1994 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
27.07.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
24 |
|
27.07.1993 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
20.07.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1993 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1993 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1993 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1993 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1993 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.07.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.04.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.03.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.03.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.03.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.02.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.12.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.12.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.1992 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1992 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1992 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Description |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
20.07.1992 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.05.1992 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.04.1992 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.12.1991 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.11.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.1991 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1991 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.1991 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.11.1991 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
06.09.1991 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.1991 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.07.1991 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.07.1991 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1991 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.1991 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.1991 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.06.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.1991 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1991 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.05.1991 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1991 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1991 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.05.1991 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.1991 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1991 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.1991 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.1991 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.04.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.04.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.04.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.1991 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.1991 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.1991 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.12.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.1990 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.1990 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1990 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.1990 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.07.1990 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.03.1990 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.03.1990 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.09.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.1989 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.1989 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.1989 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.09.1989 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.07.1989 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.1989 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.1989 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.1989 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1989 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1989 |
Annex |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1989 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1989 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1989 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1989 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.1989 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.1988 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.1988 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.1988 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1988 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.1988 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.10.1988 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.09.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.1988 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.09.1988 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.09.1988 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.09.1988 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.11.1987 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1987 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1987 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.1987 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.1987 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.1987 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.1987 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
02.02.1987 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1985 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.1984 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.1984 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1984 |
European search report |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.1984 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1984 |
Priority document |
Opposition |
17 |
|
08.06.1984 |
Abstract |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1984 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.1984 |
Description |
Opposition |
11 |
|
08.06.1984 |
Designation of inventor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1984 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1984 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Opposition |
10 |