EP0132047 - Hemodialysis access monitor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.11.1988 [1988/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McNeilab, Inc. Spring House Pennsylvania / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/08] | For all designated states McNeilab, Inc. Spring House Pennsylvania / US | ||
Former [1985/04] | For all designated states EXTRACORPOREAL MEDICAL SPECIALITIES INC. Royal and Ross Road King of Prussia Pennsylvania 19406 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Troutner, Vernon H. 6221 58th Avenue North St Petersburg, FL 33709 / US | [1985/04] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | Jones, Alan John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 84304019.7 | 14.06.1984 | [1985/04] | Priority number, date | US19830504659 | 15.06.1983 Original published format: US 504659 | [1985/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0132047 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0132047 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/14, G01L19/12 | [1985/04] | CPC: |
A61M1/3639 (EP,US);
A61M1/30 (EP,US);
A61M1/302 (EP,US);
A61M2205/18 (EP);
A61M2205/3344 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3351 (EP,US);
Y10S128/13 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/04] | Title | German: | Zugangsmonitor für die Hämodialyse | [1985/04] | English: | Hemodialysis access monitor | [1985/04] | French: | Moniteur d'accès pour hémodialyse | [1985/04] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/37] | 23.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.06.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3756234 [ ] (KOPP K); | US3883272 [ ] (PUCKETT BENJAMIN V); | CH623134 [ ] (GAMBRO AB [SE]); | EP0104897 [ ] (EXTRACORPOREAL MED SPEC [US]) |