|
26.06.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.11.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.01.2005 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.1999 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1999 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1999 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1998 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.09.1998 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.1998 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.09.1998 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.05.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.1998 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.05.1998 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1998 |
Description |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
12.05.1998 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
15 |
|
12.05.1998 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1998 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1998 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1998 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.02.1998 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1998 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.1998 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.1997 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.12.1997 |
Description |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.12.1997 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.1997 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.1997 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.1997 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.1997 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.1997 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.07.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.1997 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.03.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.02.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.02.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.02.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.02.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.02.1997 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
17 |
|
29.01.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.01.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.1997 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Oral proceedings: Annex to summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Oral proceedings: Annex to summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.01.1997 |
Oral proceedings: Annex to summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.01.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.01.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.1996 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.1996 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
09.02.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
62 |
|
01.02.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
01.02.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.1995 |
Drawings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.02.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
01.02.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
01.02.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
01.02.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.02.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.02.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.02.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.02.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
01.02.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
33 |
|
01.02.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
20.04.1994 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.1994 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.01.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.01.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.01.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.12.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
7 |
|
07.10.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.04.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.04.1993 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.1993 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.1993 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.1993 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
20 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1992 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.10.1992 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.10.1992 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.10.1992 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.10.1992 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.10.1992 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.10.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.04.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
15 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
10 |
|
23.03.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.03.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.1992 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.03.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.03.1992 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.03.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.03.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.02.1992 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1992 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
13 |
|
27.12.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
27.12.1991 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
18 |
|
08.11.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1991 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.02.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
20 |
|
10.01.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.01.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.01.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.01.1991 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.01.1991 |
Description |
Opposition |
26 |
|
10.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.01.1991 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.1990 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.1990 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
03.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
03.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
20 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.06.1989 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1989 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1989 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.1989 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.1989 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.1988 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.1988 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.1988 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.1988 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
128 |
|
28.06.1988 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.01.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.01.1988 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.12.1987 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.1987 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.09.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1987 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.08.1985 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.1985 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.1985 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.1985 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1985 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1985 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1985 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1985 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.09.1984 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1984 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1984 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.1984 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.08.1984 |
Description |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
29.08.1984 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.1984 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
29.08.1984 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.1984 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
56 |
|
29.08.1984 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
29.08.1984 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
77 |
|
29.08.1984 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |