EP0136840 - Opto-electric logic element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/15] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Syuji c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1985/15] | Representative(s) | Pears, David Ashley, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1985/15] | Application number, filing date | 84306040.1 | 04.09.1984 | [1985/15] | Priority number, date | JP19830163449 | 06.09.1983 Original published format: JP 16344983 | JP19840076787 | 17.04.1984 Original published format: JP 7678784 | [1985/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0136840 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0136840 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0136840 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G02F3/00, H01S3/103 | [1985/15] | CPC: |
G02F3/026 (EP,US);
G02F3/00 (EP,US);
H01S5/0608 (EP,US);
H01S5/06213 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1985/15] | Title | German: | Opto-elektronisches logisches Element | [1985/15] | English: | Opto-electric logic element | [1985/15] | French: | Elément logique opto-électronique | [1985/15] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1984 | Examination requested [1985/15] | 17.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3654497 (DYMENT JOHN C, et al); | [A]GB2114768 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO); | [X]GB1097066 (RCA CORP) | [A] - IEEE SPECTRUM, vol. 18, June 181, pages 26-33, IEEE, New York, US; P.W. SMITH et al.: "Bistable optical devices promise subpicosecond switching" |