EP0139503 - Fluid sealing structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.06.1990 [1990/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEORGE ANGUS & COMPANY LIMITED Angus House Westgate Road Newcastle upon Tyne NE99 1TG / GB | [1985/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnston, David Ernest 3 Stoneyhurst Road Gosforth Newcastle upon Tyne NE3 1PQ / GB | 02 /
Lopes, Rui de Jesus 27 Holywell Road North Shields Tyne and Wear NE29 7NL / GB | [1985/18] | Representative(s) | Weston, Robert Dale, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/04] | Weston, Robert Dale, et al c/o PHILLIPS & LEIGH 7 Staple Inn High Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | ||
Former [1987/51] | Farwell, William Robert PHILLIPS & LEIGH 7 Staple Inn High Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | ||
Former [1985/18] | Weston, Walter PHILLIPS & LEIGH 7 Staple Inn Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | Application number, filing date | 84306775.2 | 04.10.1984 | [1985/18] | Priority number, date | GB19830026706 | 06.10.1983 Original published format: GB 8326706 | [1985/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0139503 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0139503 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0139503 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0139503 | Date: | 08.12.1989 | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/32 | [1985/18] | CPC: |
F16J15/3268 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/18] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsdichtung | [1985/18] | English: | Fluid sealing structure | [1985/18] | French: | Garniture pour fluide | [1985/18] | Examination procedure | 23.08.1985 | Examination requested [1985/45] | 17.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 05.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2736207 [ ] (GOETZE AG) | Examination | US3053542 |