EP0143541 - Method for producing silicone aqueous emulsion compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.1990 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toray Silicone Company Limited Mitsui Building No. 6 2-8 Nihombashi-Muromachi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/23] | For all designated states Toray Silicone Company Limited Mitsui Building No. 6 2-8 Nihombashi-Muromachi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kondo, Hidetoshi 1-6, Yushidainishi Ichihara-shi Chiba-Ken / JP | 02 /
Koshii, Taro 5-1-9- Todoroki-Cho Chiba-shi Chiba-Ken / JP | [1985/23] | Representative(s) | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/23] | Laredo, Jack Joseph, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 84307208.3 | 19.10.1984 | [1985/23] | Priority number, date | JP19830204482 | 31.10.1983 Original published format: JP 20448283 | [1985/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0143541 | Date: | 05.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0143541 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/06, C08K5/54, C08L83/06 | [1989/22] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/4966 (EP,US);
C04B41/64 (EP,US);
C08J3/03 (EP,US);
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00112 (EP,US);
C08G77/16 (EP,US);
C08G77/18 (EP,US);
C08G77/24 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B28/02 (US,EP);
C04B41/4966, C04B41/4539, C04B41/4922, C04B41/502, C04B41/5035, C04B2103/402 (EP,US);
C08L83/04, C08L2666/44, C08L2666/54 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [1985/23] | C08J3/02, C08J3/04, C08J3/06, D06M15/643, C09D3/82 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1985/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Zusammensetzungen aus wasserhaltigen Silikonemulsionen | [1985/23] | English: | Method for producing silicone aqueous emulsion compositions | [1985/23] | French: | Méthode de préparation de compositions à base d'une émulsion aqueuse de silicone | [1985/23] | Examination procedure | 20.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/06] | 18.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB2075040 [ ] (DOW CORNING LTD); | US4221688 [ ] (JOHNSON ROBERT D, et al); | US4244849 [ ] (SAAM JOHN C); | US4218359 [ ] (LOUIS ECKHART [DE], et al) | [XD] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 7, No. 161 (C-176)(1306), July 15, 1983 | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 7, No. 161 (C-176)(1306), July 15, 1983 | Examination | - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 7, No. 161 (C-176)(1306), July 15, 1983 & JP A 58 69 250 (SHINETSU KAGAKU KOGYO K.K.) (25-04-1983) |