|
03.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1998 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.1998 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1997 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.1997 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.1997 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.1997 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.1997 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.1997 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.12.1997 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1997 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.1997 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.1997 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.1997 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.1997 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
24 |
|
20.11.1997 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1997 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.11.1997 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.11.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.11.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.1997 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
20.10.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1997 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.1997 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.1997 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.10.1997 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.08.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.08.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.1997 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.07.1997 |
Communication of amended entries |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1994 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.04.1994 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1994 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.1994 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.11.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.1993 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.1993 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.05.1993 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.05.1993 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1993 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1993 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1993 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1993 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1993 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.1993 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.1993 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.02.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.02.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.01.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1993 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
29.01.1993 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1993 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1993 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1993 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1993 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1993 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1993 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1993 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
16 |
|
29.01.1993 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.12.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.12.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1992 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.12.1992 |
Request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1992 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
30.11.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.07.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.07.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.07.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.07.1992 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.06.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.1992 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1992 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.05.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.04.1991 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.1991 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1991 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1991 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1991 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.1991 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1991 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1991 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1991 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1991 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1991 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.03.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.03.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.03.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.03.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.02.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
26.02.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.02.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.02.1991 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.02.1991 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.02.1991 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.1990 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.1990 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1990 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1990 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.1990 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.1989 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.11.1989 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.1989 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1989 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.1989 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
11.04.1989 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.1989 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.1989 |
Communication concerning signing of documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.01.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.09.1988 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.01.1987 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.1987 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.1986 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.1986 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.1986 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.1986 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1986 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.05.1985 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.1985 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.1985 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.1984 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.1984 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.12.1984 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.1984 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.1984 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
04.12.1984 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.12.1984 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |