EP0130892 - Deployable anti-tank mine with automatic alignment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.1988 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.1988 [1988/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETIENNE LACROIX - TOUS ARTIFICES SA Route de Toulouse 31600 Muret / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | For all designated states ETIENNE LACROIX - TOUS ARTIFICES SA Route de Toulouse F-31600 Muret / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fauvel, Jean-Robert 10, route de Labarthe F-31600 Muret / FR | 02 /
Rousseau, Philippe 12, boulevard Saint-Germain F-75005 Paris / FR | 03 /
Thebault, Pierre 40, rue Romain Rolland F-31520 Ramonville Saint Agne / FR | 04 /
van Schendel, Daniel Les Carretes F-31600 Muret / FR | [1985/02] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/02] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401309.4 | 22.06.1984 | [1985/02] | Priority number, date | FR19830010573 | 27.06.1983 Original published format: FR 8310573 | [1985/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0130892 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0130892 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F42B23/04 | [1985/02] | CPC: |
F42B23/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [1985/02] | Title | German: | Abwerfbare Panzermine mit selbsttätiger Ausrichtung | [1985/02] | English: | Deployable anti-tank mine with automatic alignment | [1985/02] | French: | Mine antichar dispersable à positionnement automatique | [1985/02] | Examination procedure | 22.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/27] | 17.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2435690 (ALSETEX); | [A]EP0069914 (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]) |