EP0140725 - Process for the treatment of a polysaccharide solution, and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.1988 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.1988 [1988/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/39] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1985/19] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC SPECIALITES CHIMIQUES "Les Miroirs" 18, Avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gozard, Jean-Pierre 29, rue du Commandant Faurax F-69006 Lyon / FR | 02 /
Jarry, Alain Le Paradis - Maisonnais F-79500 Melle / FR | 03 /
Lucioni, Alain 25, rue Docteur Faquin F-69500 Bron / FR | [1985/19] | Representative(s) | Tavernier, Colette, et al RHONE-POULENC INTERSERVICES Service Brevets Chimie 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [1985/19] | Application number, filing date | 84401663.4 | 13.08.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | FR19830013885 | 30.08.1983 Original published format: FR 8313885 | [1985/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0140725 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0140725 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/06, E21B43/22 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
C12P19/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, SE [1985/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung einer Lösung von Polysaccharid und ihre Verwendung | [1985/19] | English: | Process for the treatment of a polysaccharide solution, and its use | [1985/19] | French: | Procédé de traitement d'une solution de polysaccharide et son utilisation | [1985/19] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 19.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/35] | 18.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.03.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0039962 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [Y]EP0049012 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]); | [XD]GB2099008 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE) | [X] - CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, vol. 77, 1979, pages 289-292, Elsevier Scientific Publishing Co., Amsterdam, NL; G.J. WALKER et al.: "Hydrolysis of (1-3)-alpha-D-glucosidic linkages in oligosaccharides and polysaccharides by Cladosporium resinae exo-(1-3)-alpha-D-glucanase" | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 65, 1966, colonne 9252, point e, Columbus, Ohio, US; SHIRO HASEGAWA et al.: "Alpha-1,3-glucanase from a fungal source" & CHEM. IND. (London), 1966(25), 1033 |