|
06.10.1993 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1993 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.1993 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1993 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.05.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1993 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1993 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.1993 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.1993 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.03.1993 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.1992 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.03.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1992 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.01.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.01.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1991 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.12.1991 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.12.1991 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.1991 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.07.1991 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.03.1991 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.1991 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
11.01.1991 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.08.1990 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.07.1990 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.1990 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
11.06.1990 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1990 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.1990 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1990 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.03.1990 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.03.1990 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1990 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.1990 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1989 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1989 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1989 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.08.1989 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1989 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.1989 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.08.1989 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.08.1989 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.1989 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.07.1989 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.1989 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1989 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.1989 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1989 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1989 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1989 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
7 |
|
03.05.1989 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.04.1989 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.02.1989 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.1989 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.10.1988 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.1988 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.10.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.10.1988 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.10.1988 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
14.09.1988 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.1988 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.1988 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1988 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
10.08.1988 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
10.08.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
42 |
|
09.08.1988 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.01.1988 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.1987 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.1987 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
06.10.1987 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1987 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1987 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1987 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.1987 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.1987 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.1987 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1987 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.1987 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.03.1987 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.1987 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.1987 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1987 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.02.1987 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.1986 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.07.1985 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.05.1985 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.1985 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.04.1985 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.1985 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.1985 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1985 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.1985 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.1985 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
20.02.1985 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
11.02.1985 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.1985 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.1985 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.1985 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.1984 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.1984 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.11.1984 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.1984 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.1984 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
26.11.1984 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
2 |