EP0202335 - SIGNAL LIGHT UNIT HAVING HEAT DISSIPATING FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 04.10.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAPAN TRAFFIC MANAGEMENT TECHNOLOGY ASSOCIATION No. 6, Ichigaya-Tamachi 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162 / JP | For all designated states Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 9-13, Nakameguro 2-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | For all designated states KOITO INDUSTRIES, LTD. 100, Maeda-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/48] | For all designated states JAPAN TRAFFIC MANAGEMENT TECHNOLOGY ASSOCIATION No. 6, Ichigaya-Tamachi 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162 / JP | ||
For all designated states Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 9-13, Nakameguro 2-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | |||
For all designated states KOITO INDUSTRIES, LTD. 100, Maeda-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUZAWA, Masami 14-15, Minamitsukushino 4-chome Machida-shi Tokyo 194 / JP | 02 /
TOMINAGA, Muneharu 2-47-102, Shiohama 4-chome Ichikawa-shi Chiba 272-01 / JP | 03 /
UCHIYAMA, Yoshinori 16-22, Tsurukawa 3-chome Machida-shi Tokyo 194-01 / JP | 04 /
WAKI, Osamu 1-18, Kitano 1-chome Mitaka-shi Tokyo 181 / JP | 05 /
KATO, Hiroshi 3447, Fukaya Ayase-shi Kanagawa 252 / JP | 06 /
MORIKAWA, Tadahiro 1184-2, Daigiri Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251 / JP | [1986/48] | Representative(s) | Fuhlendorf, Jörn Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/48] | Fuhlendorf, Jörn, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Dreiss, Hosenthien & Fuhlendorf Gerokstrasse 6 D-70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 84904170.2 | 15.11.1984 | [1986/48] | WO1984JP00548 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8602985 | Date: | 22.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0202335 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1986/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0202335 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.05.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F21Q3/00, F21V29/00, G09F13/20, H01L33/00 | [1986/48] | CPC: |
F21V29/70 (EP,US);
B61L5/1854 (EP,US);
F21V29/51 (EP,US);
F21V29/67 (EP,US);
F21V29/763 (EP,US);
F21V31/04 (EP,US);
G08G1/095 (EP,US);
H05K1/0209 (EP,US);
B61L2207/02 (EP,US);
F21W2111/02 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10106 (EP,US);
Y10S362/80 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/48] | Title | German: | SIGNALLICHTEINHEIT MIT WÄRMEABFUHR | [1986/48] | English: | SIGNAL LIGHT UNIT HAVING HEAT DISSIPATING FUNCTION | [1986/48] | French: | UNITE DE SIGNALISATION POSSEDANT UNE FONCTION DE DISSIPATION DE CHALEUR | [1986/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.1986 | Translation filed | 22.04.1986 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.1986 | Search fee paid | 22.04.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/48] | 30.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.1990
28.08.1990
ADMISSIBLE TELEFUNKEN electronic GmbH Postfach 35 35 D-74025 Heilbronn / DE Opponent's representative Maute, Hans-Jürgen DaimlerChrysler AG, Theresienstrasse 2 74072 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.07.1990
28.08.1990
ADMISSIBLE TELEFUNKEN electronic GmbH Postfach 35 35 D-74025 Heilbronn / DE Opponent's representative Maute, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. TEMIC TELEFUNKEN microelectronic GmbH, Postfach 35 35 D-74025 Heilbronn / DE | 30.08.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.02.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.02.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 28.02.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 24.06.1991 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 04.07.1991 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1991/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.10.1989 | BE | 25.10.1989 | CH | 25.10.1989 | LI | 25.10.1989 | SE | 25.10.1989 | LU | 30.11.1989 | [1999/52] |
Former [1991/13] | AT | 25.10.1989 | |
BE | 25.10.1989 | ||
CH | 25.10.1989 | ||
LI | 25.10.1989 | ||
SE | 25.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/42] | AT | 25.10.1989 | |
CH | 25.10.1989 | ||
LI | 25.10.1989 | ||
SE | 25.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/28] | CH | 25.10.1989 | |
LI | 25.10.1989 | ||
SE | 25.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/21] | SE | 25.10.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58222578 | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 74 (E-236)[1511], 6th April 1984; & JP-A-58 222 578 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 24-12-1983, & JP58222578 A 00000000 | International search | [Y]JPS52115171U ; | [X]JPS5740963U ; | [X]JPS59119487U | Examination | DE2449433 | DE2827523 | DE3223624 | DE3236612 |