EP0159460 - A hydroformylation catalyst and process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/44] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huang, I-Der 29 Danesburg Downs Upper Saddle River New Jersey 07458 / US | 02 /
Jermansen, Torris Grahn 245 Getz Avenue Staten Island New York / US | 03 /
Oswald, Alexis Alexander 1098 Sunnyslope Drive Mountainside New Jersey / US | 04 /
Westner, Andrew Arkadij 1 Short Way Paramus New Jersey / US | [1985/44] | Representative(s) | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 12 Esso House, Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | ||
Former [1985/44] | Field, Roger Norton (GB) Carpmaels & Ransford 43 Bloomsbury Square GB-London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 85100028.1 | 12.02.1980 | [1985/44] | Priority number, date | US19790011238 | 12.02.1979 Original published format: US 11238 | US19790043548 | 29.05.1979 Original published format: US 43548 | US19800114627 | 23.01.1980 Original published format: US 114627 | [1985/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0159460 | Date: | 30.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07F15/00, C07C45/50, C07C27/20, B01J31/24 | [1985/44] | CPC: |
B01J31/1608 (EP);
B01J31/2404 (EP);
C07C45/49 (EP);
C07C45/50 (EP);
C07C45/62 (EP);
C07C45/74 (EP);
C07F15/0006 (EP);
C07F15/008 (EP);
C07F15/02 (EP);
C07F15/06 (EP);
C07F9/50 (EP);
C07F9/5004 (EP);
C07F9/5013 (EP);
C07F9/5027 (EP);
C07F9/5421 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/49, C07C47/198 (EP);
C07C45/49, C07C47/277 (EP);
C07C45/49, C07C47/32 (EP);
C07C45/50, C07C47/02 (EP); | Designated contracting states | FR [1985/44] | Title | German: | Hydroformylierungs-Katalysator und -Verfahren | [1985/44] | English: | A hydroformylation catalyst and process | [1985/44] | French: | Catalyseur et procédé d'hydroformylation | [1985/44] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/44] | 03.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/21] | 21.12.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP80900540.8 / EP0024091 | EP82107978.7 / EP0071281 | Request for further processing for: | 12.06.1986 | Request for further processing filed | 11.06.1986 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.07.1986 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3832404 [ ]; | US644446 [ ]; | US3527809 [ ] |