EP0157076 - Ink delivery system including reversible ribbon cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.1990 [1990/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WANG LABORATORIES INC. One Industrial Avenue Lowell, MA 01851 / US | [1985/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Privitera, David John 42 Jewett Street Georgetown, MA 01833 / US | [1985/41] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Dieter, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | Behrens, Dieter, Dr.-Ing., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85100045.5 | 02.01.1985 | [1985/41] | Priority number, date | US19840595063 | 30.03.1984 Original published format: US 595063 | [1985/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0157076 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0157076 | Date: | 26.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0157076 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B41J32/00, B41J33/24 | [1985/41] | CPC: |
B41J32/00 (EP,US);
B41J33/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1985/41] | Title | German: | Farbverteilungssystem mit umkehrbarer Farbbandkassette | [1985/41] | English: | Ink delivery system including reversible ribbon cartridge | [1985/41] | French: | Système distributeur d'encre comportant une cassette de ruban réversible | [1985/41] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 18.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0036308 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]GB2033340 (XEROX CORP); | [A]US4307969 (DAUGHTERS JAMES R); | [A]GB2091644 (DOBSON PARK IND) |