blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0151933

EP0151933 - Spiral heat-exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  04.12.1986
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
W. Schmidt GmbH & Co. KG
Pforzheimer Strasse 46
D-7518 Bretten / DE
[1985/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Zitzmann, Hubertus, Dipl.-Ing.
Breslauer Strasse 16
D-7518 Bretten / DE
[1985/34]
Representative(s)Brommer, Hans Joachim, et al
Lemcke, Brommer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Bismarckstrasse 16
76133 Karlsruhe / DE
[N/P]
Former [1985/34]Brommer, Hans Joachim, Dr.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. R. Lemcke Dr.-Ing. H.J. Brommer, Postfach 40 26
D-76025 Karlsruhe / DE
Application number, filing date85100227.911.01.1985
[1985/34]
Priority number, dateDE1984340437408.02.1984         Original published format: DE 3404374
[1985/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0151933
Date:21.08.1985
Language:DE
[1985/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0151933
Date:13.08.1986
Language:DE
[1986/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.1986
ClassificationIPC:F28D9/04, B01J3/00
[1986/29]
CPC:
F28D9/04 (EP,US); B01J19/24 (EP,US); B01J19/249 (EP,US);
B01J3/002 (EP,US); B01J3/04 (EP,US); B01J2219/00085 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2454 (EP,US); B01J2219/2462 (EP,US); B01J2219/247 (EP,US);
B01J2219/2485 (EP,US); B01J2219/2493 (EP,US); B01J2219/2495 (EP,US);
Y10S165/398 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [1985/34]F28D7/10, B01J3/00
Designated contracting statesBE,   FR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1985/34]
TitleGerman:Spiralwärmetauscher[1985/34]
English:Spiral heat-exchanger[1985/34]
French:Echangeur de chaleur en spirale[1985/34]
File destroyed:15.12.1992
Examination procedure27.11.1986Application withdrawn by applicant  [1987/04]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE1908385  (SCHWERMASCHB KARL LIEBKNECHT V);
 [Y]GB501389  (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG);
 [A]FR830810  (ROSENBLADS PATENTER AB);
 [A]US3921713  (SCHNITZER EMANUEL, et al);
 [A]FR2096719  (JOUET ETIENNE [FR]);
 [A]DE854656  (ROSENBLADS PATENTER AB);
 [A]DE672675  (ROSENBLADS PATENTER AB);
 [A]US2663549  (OTTEN PHILIP S);
 [A]DE2153278  (DEWANDRE CO LTD C);
 [A]DE134621  ;
 [A]US2142679  (WERNER SEIFERT)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.