EP0152754 - Foundry moulding process and mould for low-pressure precision casting with a gasifiable model and binderless sand mould [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.1988 [1988/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PONT-A-MOUSSON S.A. 91, Avenue de la Libération 54017 Nancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | For all designated states PONT-A-MOUSSON S.A. 91, Avenue de la Libération F-54017 Nancy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Denis, Jean-Pierre 04, place de Luxembourg F-54000 Nancy / FR | [1985/35] | Representative(s) | Puit, Thierry, et al Pont-à-Mousson S.A. Service de Propriété Industrielle Boîte Postale 109 F-54704 Pont-à-Mousson Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | Puit, Thierry, et al Pont-à-Mousson S.A. Service de Propriété Industrielle Boîte Postale 109 F-54704 Pont-à-Mousson Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 85100311.1 | 14.01.1985 | [1985/35] | Priority number, date | FR19840002907 | 15.02.1984 Original published format: FR 8402907 | [1985/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0152754 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0152754 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B22C9/04, B22D18/04 | [1985/35] | CPC: |
B22C9/046 (EP,US);
B22D18/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/35] | Title | German: | Giessformverfahren und Giessform für Niederdruck-Präzisionsgiessen unter Verwendung vergasbaren Modells und binderfreier Sandgiessform | [1985/35] | English: | Foundry moulding process and mould for low-pressure precision casting with a gasifiable model and binderless sand mould | [1985/35] | French: | Procédé de moulage en fonderie et moule pour la coulée de précision sous basse pression, avec modèle gazéifiable et moule en sable sans liant | [1987/25] |
Former [1985/35] | Procédé de moulage en fonderie et moule la coulée de fabrication sous basse pression, avec modèle gazéifiable et moule en sable sans liant | Examination procedure | 27.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/49] | 06.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3842899 (HAUSER LIENHARD H); | [A]FR2351733 (VKI RHEINHOLD & MAHLA AG [DE]); | [AD]FR2455491 (PONT A MOUSSON) |