|
25.06.1997 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.1997 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.1997 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.04.1997 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.01.1997 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1997 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.01.1997 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.1997 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.10.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.1996 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.10.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.1996 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.1996 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
01.10.1996 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.1996 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.1996 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.1996 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.1996 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.09.1996 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.1996 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.1996 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.1996 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.09.1996 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.1996 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.1996 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
23.06.1996 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.04.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.04.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.04.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1996 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.1996 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.1996 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.04.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.1996 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.1996 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.03.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.1996 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.1996 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.08.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.1995 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.1995 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.1995 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1995 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.1995 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.06.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1995 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.02.1995 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.05.1994 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1994 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.1994 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
12.03.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.03.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.01.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.08.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
24.06.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.1992 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.1992 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.06.1992 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1992 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.05.1992 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.04.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.04.1992 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.1992 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.04.1992 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
07.02.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.02.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.01.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.01.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1992 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1991 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.1991 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.04.1991 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.1991 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.1991 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.05.1990 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1990 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.01.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.1990 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1989 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.1989 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1989 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.10.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
03.10.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.10.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.10.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
03.10.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.10.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.10.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.10.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.10.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
03.10.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
03.10.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.10.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
02.10.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.11.1988 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.1988 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.1988 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.09.1988 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.1988 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.05.1988 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.1988 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.1988 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
25.02.1988 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.1988 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.1987 |
EPO/applicant correspondence crossed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.1987 |
Invitation to pay examination fee/designation fees with additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.06.1986 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.05.1986 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.1986 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.1986 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.1986 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of designation fee) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.1985 |
Invitation to pay designation fees with additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.1985 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.1985 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.01.1985 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.01.1985 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.1985 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.1985 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.1985 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.01.1985 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.1985 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.01.1985 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.1985 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
18.01.1985 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |