EP0153682 - Radiation-sensitive composition with acid cleavable compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 21.10.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.1992 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 09.12.1992 [1992/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/36] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneller, Arnold, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Asternweg 41 D-6500 Mainz 21 / DE | 02 /
Herwig, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Hasenpfad 7 D-6232 Bad Soden / DE | 03 /
Erbes, Kurt Friedrich-Stolz-Strasse 3 D-6093 Flörsheim 3 / DE | [1985/36] | Application number, filing date | 85101726.9 | 16.02.1985 | [1985/36] | Priority number, date | DE19843406927 | 25.02.1984 Original published format: DE 3406927 | [1985/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0153682 | Date: | 04.09.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0153682 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0153682 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/039, G03F7/004 | [1990/18] | CPC: |
G03F7/0045 (EP,US);
G03F7/04 (KR);
G03F7/021 (EP,US);
Y10S430/111 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/36] | G03F7/08, G03F7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/36] | Title | German: | Strahlungsempfindliches Gemisch auf Basis von säurespaltbaren Verbindungen | [1985/36] | English: | Radiation-sensitive composition with acid cleavable compounds | [1985/36] | French: | Composition sensible au rayonnement à base de composés scindables par les acides | [1985/36] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/51] | 02.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.1991
21.05.1991
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.1991
21.05.1991
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 24.05.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.09.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.09.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 16.11.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 13.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 23.07.1992 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1992/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DD206518 ; | [A]DE1797282 (INST FUER GRAFISCHE TECHNIK); | [Y]FR2183748 (OCE VAN DER GRINTEN NV [NL]); | [YD]EP0042562 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]EP0066452 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND [JP]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 101, Nr. 22, 26. November 1984, Seite 610, Zusammenfassung Nr. 201546k, Columbus, Ohio, US; & DD-A-206 518 (AKADEMIE DER WISSENSCHAFTEN DER DDR) 25-01-1984, & DD206518 A 00000000 |