EP0158050 - Encapsulated measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.03.1990 [1990/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/42] | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 D-83292 Traunreut / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miller, Walter, Dr. Adalbert-Stifter-Strasse 19 D-8220 Traunstein / DE | 02 /
Kraus, Heinz Traunring 74e D-8225 Traunreut / DE | [1985/42] | Application number, filing date | 85101737.6 | 16.02.1985 | [1985/42] | Priority number, date | DE19843410944 | 24.03.1984 Original published format: DE 3410944 | [1985/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0158050 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0158050 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G01D11/24, F16J15/00 | [1985/42] | CPC: |
G01D5/34769 (EP,US);
G01B3/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/42] | Title | German: | Gekapselte Messeinrichtung | [1985/42] | English: | Encapsulated measuring device | [1985/42] | French: | Dispositif de mesure capsulé | [1985/42] | Examination procedure | 28.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/42] | 16.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.08.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 07.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2241371 [ ]; | DE2623526 [ ] | Examination | - Schmid, Edgar, Handbuch der Dichtungstechnik, S. 194, f (Grafenau 1981) |