EP0152964 - Set of cuvettes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.1990 [1990/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Postfach 3255 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | ||
Former [1985/35] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE & CO. Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 3255 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Borer, Claude Ronystrasse 6b CH-6331 Hünenberg / CH | 02 /
Greter, Andreas Guntenbühl 8 CH-6312 Steinhausen / CH | [1985/35] | Representative(s) | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr.rer.nat., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85101997.6 | 22.02.1985 | [1985/35] | Priority number, date | CH19840000896 | 23.02.1984 Original published format: CH 89684 | [1985/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0152964 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0152964 | Date: | 25.06.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0152964 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/03 | [1985/35] | CPC: |
G01N21/03 (EP,US);
G01N2021/0325 (EP,US);
G01N2021/0357 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/35] | Title | German: | Küvettenanordnung | [1985/35] | English: | Set of cuvettes | [1985/35] | French: | Agencement de cuvettes | [1985/35] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1985 | Examination requested [1985/35] | 30.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3441383 (MOORE FRANCIS C, et al); | [A]US3811780 (LISTON M); | [A]US4126418 (KRASNOW LEONARD L); | [A]EP0100663 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]) |