EP0157191 - Method and apparatus for measuring velocity and position in servo system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berkeley Process Controls Inc. 5327-K Jacuzzi St. US-Richmond, California 94804 / US | [1985/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sagues, Paul 1731-D Spruce Street Berkeley California 94709 / US | [1985/41] | Representative(s) | Howden, Christopher A., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/41] | Howden, Christopher Andrew, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85102402.6 | 04.03.1985 | [1985/41] | Priority number, date | US19840586250 | 05.03.1984 Original published format: US 586250 | [1985/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0157191 | Date: | 09.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0157191 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0157191 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/407, G01P3/42 | [1990/29] | CPC: |
G05B19/21 (EP,US);
G01P13/045 (EP,US);
G05B19/4142 (EP,US);
G05B2219/34006 (EP,US);
G05B2219/34242 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35238 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1985/41] | G05B19/407 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Messen der Geschwindigkeit und der Position in einem Servomechanismus | [1985/41] | English: | Method and apparatus for measuring velocity and position in servo system | [1985/41] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la mesure de la vitesse et de la position dans un système asservi | [1985/41] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/49] | 22.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.12.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.07.1990 | BE | 18.07.1990 | SE | 18.07.1990 | LU | 31.03.1991 | [1999/52] |
Former [1991/34] | AT | 18.07.1990 | |
BE | 18.07.1990 | ||
SE | 18.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/29] | AT | 18.07.1990 | |
SE | 18.07.1990 | ||
Former [1991/16] | SE | 18.07.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2150397 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [Y]US4214193 (MASON MARTIN K [US]); | [Y]US4245297 (BERTRAM SIDNEY); | [Y]WO8102347 (ZEUS INT TRADING CO LTD [GB], et al) |