EP0160943 - Method and apparatus for creating fonts for an electronic character generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 01.07.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes, Inc. Walter H. Wheeler, Jr. Drive Stamford Connecticut 06926 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/46] | For all designated states PITNEY BOWES, INC. Walter H. Wheeler, Jr. Drive Stamford Connecticut 06926 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parker, Harry L. 756 Tunxis Hill Rd. Fairfield, CT 06430 / US | [1985/46] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1985/46] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7/II Aufg. D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85105387.6 | 03.05.1985 | [1985/46] | Priority number, date | US19840607556 | 07.05.1984 Original published format: US 607556 | [1985/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0160943 | Date: | 13.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0160943 | Date: | 29.01.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0160943 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G06K15/10 | [1985/46] | CPC: |
G06K15/10 (EP,US);
B41B19/00 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0028 (EP,US);
G06K2215/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1985/46] | Title | German: | Methode und Apparat zur Erzeugung von Drucktypenarten für einen elektronischen Schriftzeichengenerator | [1985/46] | English: | Method and apparatus for creating fonts for an electronic character generator | [1985/46] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la création de jeux de types de lettres d'imprimerie pour un générateur électronique de caractères | [1985/46] | Examination procedure | 07.03.1986 | Examination requested [1986/20] | 05.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.05.1990
07.08.1990
ADMISSIBLE Francotyp- Postalia GmbH Postfach 15 14 84 D-13362 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.05.1990
07.08.1990
ADMISSIBLE Francotyp- Postalia GmbH Postfach 15 14 84 D-13362 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Schaumburg, Thoenes & Thurn Mauerkircherstrasse 31 D-81634 München / DE | 05.07.1990 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 09.08.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.12.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M05) | 07.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 18.03.1992 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 28.03.1992 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1992/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.04.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2539738 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]DE2928865 (DENNISON MFG CO) |