EP0200797 - Monolithic digital integrated circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1990 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.1990 [1990/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/46] | For all designated states Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 D-79108 Freiburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uhlenhoff, Arnold, Dipl.-Ing. Hölderlinstrasse 33 D-7830 Emmendingen / DE | [1986/46] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1989/10] |
Former [1986/46] | Morstadt, Volker, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche ITT Industries GmbH, Patentabteilung, Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 D-79108 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 85105578.0 | 07.05.1985 | [1986/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0200797 | Date: | 12.11.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0200797 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/04 | [1986/46] | CPC: |
G06F1/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1987/10] |
Former [1986/46] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Monolithisch integrierte Digitalschaltung | [1986/46] | English: | Monolithic digital integrated circuit | [1986/46] | French: | Circuit intégré monolithique numérique | [1986/46] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/09] | 24.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58219625 ; | [A]JP58166419 ; | [A]JP5880724 ; | [A]US4503490 (THOMPSON JOHN S [US]) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 75 (P-266) [1512], 7. April 1984; & JP - A - 58 219 625 (OKI DENKI KOGYO K.K.) 21-12-1983, & JP58219625 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 1 (P-246) [1438], 6. Januar 1984; & JP - A - 58 166 419 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 01-10-1983, & JP58166419 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 176 (P-214) [1321], 4. August 1983; & JP - A - 58 80 724 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 14-05-1983, & JP5880724 A 00000000 |