EP0166239 - Process for producing concrete-reinforcing steel bars or rods emerging from the rolling mill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 03.02.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.1992 | Opposition rejected | published on 25.03.1992 [1992/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VON ROLL AG 4563 Gerlafingen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | For all designated states VON ROLL AG CH-4563 Gerlafingen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Elsner, Emil, Dr. Privatstrasse 14 CH-4563 Gerlafingen / CH | 02 /
Brehmer, Horst Lupinenstrasse 1 CH-4563 Gerlafingen / CH | [1986/01] | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1986/01] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 CH-8008 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 85106499.8 | 25.05.1985 | [1986/01] | Priority number, date | CH19840002675 | 30.05.1984 Original published format: CH 267584 | [1986/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0166239 | Date: | 02.01.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0166239 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/08, C21D9/52 | [1986/01] | CPC: |
C21D9/525 (EP,US);
C21D8/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Betonstahl in Form von Stäben oder Walzdraht | [1986/01] | English: | Process for producing concrete-reinforcing steel bars or rods emerging from the rolling mill | [1986/01] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'acier à béton sous forme de barres ou de fil | [1986/01] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1986 | Examination requested [1986/34] | 21.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 29.01.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.06.1990
05.07.1990
ADMISSIBLE Voest- Alpine Stahl Donawitz GmbH Postfach 1 A-8700 Leoben-Donawitz / AT Opponent's representative Haffner, Thomas M. Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte KG Schottengasse 3a 1014 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.06.1990
05.07.1990
ADMISSIBLE Voest- Alpine Stahl Donawitz GmbH Postfach 1 A-8700 Leoben-Donawitz / AT Opponent's representative Haffner, Thomas M., Dr. Patentanwalt Schottengasse 3a A-1014 Wien / AT | 01.08.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.11.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.11.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 21.10.1991 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 31.10.1991 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1992/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]BE737682 ; | [A]FR2103905 (THY MARCINELLE MONCEAU); | [X]BE824960 ; | [X]US4060428 (WILSON NORMAN A, et al); | [X]GB1493230 (CENTRE RECH METALLURGIQUE, et al); | [X]DE2717780 (HAMBURGER STAHLWERKE GMBH); | [A]GB1569552 (ARBED, et al); | [A]BE889575 (CENTRE RECH METALLURGIQUE) |