EP0173823 - Circuit arrangement for controlled filling up and refilling of containers with liquids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1991 [1991/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company P.O.Drawer 1734 Atlanta, GA 30301 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/11] | For all designated states Bosch-Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 D-81669 München / DE | ||
For all designated states THE COCA-COLA COMPANY P.O.Drawer 1734 Atlanta, Georgia 30301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aschberger, Matthias, Dipl.-Ing. Am Läutenberg 9/1 D-7928 Giengen / DE | 02 /
Färber, Karlheinz, Dipl.-Ing. Giegerweg 1 D-7928 Giengen / DE | 03 /
Deininger, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. Vogtstrasse 20 D-8887 Bachhagel / DE | [1986/11] | Representative(s) | Rode, Franz, et al BOSCH-SIEMENS HAUSGERÄTE GMBH Patent- und Vertragswesen Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/11] | Rode, Franz, et al BOSCH-SIEMENS HAUSGERÄTE GMBH Patent- und Vertragswesen Hochstrasse 17 D-81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85108555.5 | 10.07.1985 | [1986/11] | Priority number, date | DE19843430907 | 22.08.1984 Original published format: DE 3430907 | [1986/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0173823 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0173823 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0173823 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G05D9/12, B67D1/00 | [1986/38] | CPC: |
G05D9/12 (EP,US);
F17C5/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1986/11] | G05D9/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/11] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zum geregelten Auffüllen und Nachfüllen von Behältern mit Flüssigkeiten | [1986/11] | English: | Circuit arrangement for controlled filling up and refilling of containers with liquids | [1986/11] | French: | Dispositif de montage pour faire le plein et le remplissage commandés des réservoirs de liquides | [1986/11] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/50] | 27.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP54102480 ; | [AP]JP59119404 ; | [A]US4194650 (NOTTKE JAMES E [US], et al); | [A]DE2818286 ; | [A]EP0028067 (KENWOOD MFG CO LTD [GB]); | [A]DE3038045 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]); | [A]EP0080253 (COCA COLA CO [US]); | [AP]GB2154986 (MICROFLOW) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 3, Nr. 126 (M-77), 20. Oktober 1979, Seite 50 M 77; & JP - A - 54 102 480 (HITACHI) 11.08.1979, & JP54102480 A 00000000 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 245 (P-312)[1682], 10. November 1984; & JP - A - 59 119 404 (FUJI) 10.07.1984 (Kat. A), & JP59119404 A 00000000 |