EP0174003 - Holder for ingot and crucible [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.07.1991 [1991/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forschungszentrum Jülich GmbH Wilhelm-Johnen-Strasse D-52425 Jülich / DE | [1986/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boden, Karl Siemenstrasse 20 D-5170 Jülich / DE | 02 /
Ibach, Harald, Prof., Dr. Kalkbergstrasse 167 D-5100 Aachen-Verlautenheide / DE | 03 /
Linke, Udo Im Reuter 37 D-5160 Düren / DE | [1986/11] | Application number, filing date | 85111100.5 | 03.09.1985 | [1986/11] | Priority number, date | DE19843432467 | 04.09.1984 Original published format: DE 3432467 | [1986/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0174003 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0174003 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0174003 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C30B15/30, C30B13/32 | [1986/11] | CPC: |
C30B15/30 (EP,US);
C30B13/32 (EP,US);
Y10S117/917 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1008 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1072 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/11] | Title | German: | Stab- und Tiegel-Halterung | [1986/11] | English: | Holder for ingot and crucible | [1986/11] | French: | Porteur de tige et creuset | [1986/11] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/29] | 24.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5969491 ; | [A]FR1340477 (PHILIPS NV); | [A]DE1519838 (NIPPON ELECTRIC INDUSTRY COMPA); | [AD]DE2306755 (SIEMENS AG) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 26, Nr. 10B, März 1984, Seiten 5542-5543, IBM CORP., New York, US; K.M. KIM et al.: "Elimination of crystal orbiting in czochralski cable puller with a coaxial magnet and magnetic weight" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 172 (C-237)[1609], 9. August 1984; & JP-A-59 69 491 (GAKEI DENKI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 19-04-1984, & JP5969491 A 00000000 |