EP0176107 - Multistage annealing of aramide reverse osmosis membranes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buckfelder, John Joseph 206 Pinehurst Road Wilmington Delaware 19803 / US | 02 /
Schleinitz, Henry Max 353 Calvert Circle Kennett Square Pennsylvania 19348 / US | [1986/14] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/14] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85112312.5 | 27.09.1985 | [1986/14] | Priority number, date | US19840655085 | 27.09.1984 Original published format: US 655085 | [1986/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0176107 | Date: | 02.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0176107 | Date: | 25.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01D13/04 | [1986/14] | CPC: |
B01D67/0083 (EP,US);
B01D71/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1986/14] | Title | German: | Mehrstufiges Tempern von Umkehrosmosemembranen aus aromatischen Polyamid | [1986/14] | English: | Multistage annealing of aramide reverse osmosis membranes | [1986/14] | French: | Recuit en plusieurs étapes de membranes pour osmose inverse en polyamide aromatique | [1986/14] | File destroyed: | 19.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 12.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/11] | 13.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/31] | 01.03.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3718722 (LEE L); | [A]DE2729847 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]US4087388 (JENSEN JAMES HENRY, et al); | [A]EP0068459 (DU PONT [US]); | [A]EP0069305 (DU PONT [US]) |