|
22.08.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1996 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.08.1995 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1995 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.1995 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.1995 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.1995 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1995 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
28 |
|
15.05.1995 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1995 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.05.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.03.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.1995 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.1995 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.03.1995 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
23.02.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.1995 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
05.07.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.12.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
18.10.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.08.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.1993 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.03.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.1993 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
23.02.1993 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.1993 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.1993 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.01.1993 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.11.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.11.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
17 |
|
30.06.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.06.1992 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.02.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.02.1992 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.08.1991 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.1991 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1990 |
Claims |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.12.1990 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.11.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.1990 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.05.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.09.1989 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.1989 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.1989 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.1989 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.04.1989 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.02.1989 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.1989 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1988 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.1988 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
05.09.1988 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.07.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.07.1988 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
28.07.1988 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.1988 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.1988 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.10.1987 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.1987 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.1987 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.1987 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.1987 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.1987 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.04.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.03.1987 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.1986 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.1986 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.1986 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.1986 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.1986 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.01.1986 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.1986 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.1985 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.10.1985 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.1985 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
01.10.1985 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
01.10.1985 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.1985 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
01.10.1985 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.1985 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
01.10.1985 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |