EP0180834 - 4-Alkoxypyrido[2,3-d]pyrimidine derivatives, process for their preparation and medicaments containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GÖDECKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Salzufer 16 D-10587 Berlin / DE | [1986/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kleinschroth, Jürgen, Dr. Freiburger Strasse 13 D-7809 Denzlingen / DE | 02 /
Satzinger, Gerhard, Dr. Im Mattenbühl 7 D-7809 Denzlingen / DE | 03 /
Mannhardt, Karl, Dr. Pfauenstrasse 14 D-7807 Elzach-Oberprechtal / DE | 04 /
Hartenstein, Johannes, Dr. Fohrenbühl 23 D-7801 Stegen-Wittental / DE | 05 /
Osswald, Hartmut, Prof. Dr. Kiefernweg 1 D-7808 Waldkirch 2 / DE | 06 /
Weinheimer, Günter, Dr. Sachsenstrasse 4 D-7809 Denzlingen / DE | 07 /
Fritschi, Edgar, Dr. Am Scheuerwald 2 D-7811 St. Peter / DE | [1986/20] | Application number, filing date | 85113270.4 | 18.10.1985 | [1986/20] | Priority number, date | DE19843438351 | 19.10.1984 Original published format: DE 3438351 | [1986/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0180834 | Date: | 14.05.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0180834 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/505, // (C07D471/04, 239:00, 221:00) | [1986/20] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/20] | Title | German: | 4-Alkoxy-pyrido[2,3-d]pyrimidin-Derivate, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und diese enthaltende Arzneimittel | [1986/20] | English: | 4-Alkoxypyrido[2,3-d]pyrimidine derivatives, process for their preparation and medicaments containing them | [1986/20] | French: | Dérivés de la 4-oxopyrido[2,3-d]pyrimidine, procédé pour leur préparation et médicaments les contenant | [1986/20] | Examination procedure | 18.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/20] | 13.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.07.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.10.1989 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE525394 ; | [A]US3673184 (MINAMI SHINSAKU, et al) | [AD] - ARZNEIMITTEL FORSCHUNG, Band 31(II), Nr. 8, 1981, Seiten 1173-1177, Aulendorf, DE; VON H. MEYER et al.: "2-Aminodihydropyridine Struktur und antihypertensive Wirksamkeit" |