EP0183999 - Microencapsulated Pyrethroids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.07.1992 [1992/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. (a Pennsylvania corp.) Three Parkway Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/52] | For all designated states ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. (a Pennsylvania corp.) Three Parkway Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102 / US | ||
Former [1986/24] | For all designated states PENNWALT CORPORATION Pennwalt Building Three Parkway Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dahl, Gerd H. 679 Jefferson Road Bryn Mawr Pennsylvania 19010 / US | 02 /
Simkin, Joseph C116 7737 N. Kendall Drive Miami Florida 33156 / US | [1986/24] | Representative(s) | Kraus, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/24] | Kraus, Walter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Kraus, Weisert & Partner Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 D-80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 85114002.0 | 04.11.1985 | [1986/24] | Priority number, date | US19840668231 | 05.11.1984 Original published format: US 668231 | US19850726735 | 24.04.1985 Original published format: US 726735 | [1986/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0183999 | Date: | 11.06.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0183999 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/28, B01J13/02 | [1986/24] | CPC: |
A01N25/28 (EP,KR,US);
A01N25/24 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/24] | Title | German: | Mikroverkapselte Pyrethroide | [1986/24] | English: | Microencapsulated Pyrethroids | [1986/24] | French: | Pyrèthroides micro-encapsulés | [1986/24] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/50] | 16.05.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 22.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3577515 (VANDEGAER JAN E); | [YD]US3959464 (DESAVIGNY CHESTER BLAIR); | [Y]US4056610 (BARBER JR LOREN L, et al); | [XP]US4497793 (SIMKIN JOSEPH [US]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 93, no. 3, 21st July 1980, page 174, no. 20237f, Columbus, Ohio, US; M.S. MULLA et al.: "New pyrethroids as mosquito larvicides and their effects on nontarget organisms", & MOSQ. NEWS 1980, 40(1), 6-12 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 89, no. 13, 25th September 1978, page 203, no. 101308z, Columbus, Ohio, US; M.S. MULLA et al.: "Toxicity of mosquito larvicidal pyrethroids to four species of freshwater fishes", & ENVIRON. ENTOMOL. 1978, 7(3), 428-30 |