EP0180284 - One-piece printed circuit board connector shell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.1987 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/19] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nailor III, William Kirby 2901 Merion Road Camp Hill Pennsylvania 17011 / US | 02 /
Sarricks, Jeffrey Dale 17 Welty Avenue Dillsburg Pennsylvania 17019 / US | [1986/19] | Representative(s) | van der Beek, George F., et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/19] | van der Beek, George Frans, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 85201751.6 | 28.10.1985 | [1986/19] | Priority number, date | US19840665954 | 29.10.1984 Original published format: US 665954 | [1986/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0180284 | Date: | 07.05.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0180284 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/516 | [1986/19] | CPC: |
H01R13/648 (EP);
H01R13/516 (KR);
H05K1/14 (KR);
H01R12/727 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/19] | Title | German: | Einstückige Schale für einen Verbinder für Leiterplatten | [1986/19] | English: | One-piece printed circuit board connector shell | [1986/19] | French: | Coquille en une pièce pour un connecteur pour carte à circuit imprimé | [1986/19] | File destroyed: | 22.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 27.10.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]US4518209 (NEGLEY LOREN E [US]); | [XP]US4512618 (KUMAR VIJAY [US]); | [XP]US4521062 (KURBIKOFF PETER A [US], et al); | [XP]US4506937 (COSMOS PETE [US], et al); | [Y]EP0118168 (AMP INC [US]); | [Y]US2790153 (ARSON SAMUEL L); | [A]US3167372 (LAWSON GUSTAF R) |