|
17.12.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.1997 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.1997 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.1992 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.04.1992 |
Transmission of the new certificate for a European patent pursuant to 87 EPC in conjunction with Rule 74 EPC |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.1992 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.02.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.1991 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.12.1991 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
10.10.1991 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.1991 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.1991 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.1991 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.1991 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1991 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1991 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1991 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.1991 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.1991 |
Description |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.06.1991 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.06.1991 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.1991 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.1991 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.03.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1991 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.1991 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.11.1990 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.11.1990 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.05.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.05.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.05.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.02.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.01.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.01.1990 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
29.11.1989 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.11.1989 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.1989 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.1989 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.1989 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.10.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1989 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.1989 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.1989 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
29.09.1989 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.1989 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.1989 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.1989 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.09.1989 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.1989 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.09.1989 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1988 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.11.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
06.05.1988 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.1988 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.1988 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.1988 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.1988 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.1988 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.1988 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.1988 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.1988 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.1988 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.01.1988 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1987 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1987 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.11.1987 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.1987 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.1987 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.1987 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1987 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.1987 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.1987 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.06.1986 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.1986 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.1986 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.1986 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.1986 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.1985 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.1985 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.1985 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.1985 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.1985 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1985 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
04.06.1985 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.06.1985 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.06.1985 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1985 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1985 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |